This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/26/2019 at 08:50:57 (UTC).

ENSLEY V ENSLEY

Case Summary

On 10/17/2013 ENSLEY filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against ENSLEY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9557

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathryn M. Ensley

Petitioner

ENSLEY, KATHRYN M

Defendant

Matthew M. Ensley

Respondent

ENSLEY, MATTHEW M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 10/21/2014 13:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • REQUEST - DISMISSAL 10/10/2014 10:55:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ENSLEY, KATHRYN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DISMISSAL - REQUEST OF PARTY 10/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE 09/24/2014 12:00:00 GENERATED BY 300 DAY STATUS CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 05/28/2014 09:15:00 GENERATED BY 240 DAY CHECKPOINT CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • NOTICE - OTHER 11/04/2013 16:00:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/17/2013 10:57:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: ENSLEY, KATHRYN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 10/17/2013 10:57:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: ENSLEY, KATHRYN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • SUMMONS 10/17/2013 10:57:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ENSLEY, KATHRYN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • PETITION - LEGAL SEPARATION 10/17/2013 10:56:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ENSLEY, KATHRYN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 10/17/2013 10:56:00 $435 5C SENT TO DUTY L67 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ENSLEY, KATHRYN M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER DENIED 10/17/2013 14:02:00 DENIED # Pages:2; Filing Party: ENSLEY, KATHRYN M

    Read MoreRead Less