This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/03/2022 at 08:31:46 (UTC).

ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. VS. EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 ENSIGN SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

Ensign Services, Inc.

Other, Cross Defendant and Defendant

Empirian Health, LLC

Cross Defendants, Plaintiffs and Defendants

Ensign Services, Inc.

Empirian Health, LLC

24th Street Healthcare Associates LLC

Alpine Health Care, LLC

Anza Healthcare, Inc.

Apache Trail Healthcare, Inc.

Arvada Healthcare, Inc.

Atlantic Memorial Healthcare Associates, Inc

Avenues Healthcare, Inc.

Aztec Healthcare, Inc.

BEAVER VALLEY HOSPITAL

BENNETT HILLS REHABILITATION & CARE CENTER

BLACK RIDGE CANYON HEALTHCARE, INC.

Bayside Healthcare, Inc.

Beacon Harbor Healthcare

Beacon Hill Healthcare, Inc.

Bell Villa Care Associates LLC

Bernardo Heights Healthcare, Inc.

Bijou Healthcare, Inc.

Bouverie Healthcare Services, Inc.

167 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Pasich LLP

Cross Defendant, Other and Defendant Attorneys

Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

Maynard, Cooper & Gale, LLP

Cross Defendant, Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Pasich LLP

Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

Maynard, Cooper & Gale, LLP

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/14/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/14/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 05/11/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 05/11/2021

MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 04/16/2021

MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 04/16/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 02/01/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 02/01/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/14/2022 08:18:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/14/2022 08:18:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND (REDACTED VERSION)) FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 02/10/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND (REDACTED VERSION)) FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 02/10/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/25/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/25/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/25/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/25/2022

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING) FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 03/01/2022

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING) FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 03/01/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13014403 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12842333.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13014403 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12842333.

STIPULATION - OTHER (TO CONTINUE HEARING DATES) FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 02/25/2022

STIPULATION - OTHER (TO CONTINUE HEARING DATES) FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 02/25/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/08/2022 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/08/2022 02:00:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/05/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/05/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 04/05/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 04/05/2022

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 04/05/2022

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 04/05/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 04/05/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 04/05/2022

277 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: CLASTER; Department: CX104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION - OTHER; Judge: CLASTER; Department: CX104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 04/22/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21149436 RECEIVED ON 04/20/2022 03:46:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1978711 RECEIVED ON 04/20/2022 05:18:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41324680 RECEIVED ON 04/20/2022 12:47:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 04/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21149252 RECEIVED ON 04/20/2022 12:47:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY EMPIRIAN HEALTH, LLC ON 04/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
509 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3983352 RECEIVED ON 02/22/2021 03:39:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41156715 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2021 08:51:07 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 02/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3976804 RECEIVED ON 02/01/2021 02:59:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12839599 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12667118.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 02/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 02/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 02/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bernardo Heights Healthcare Inc; DBA : Carmel Mountain Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Anza Healthcare Inc; DBA : VICTORIA POST ACUTE CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where ATLANTIC MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant