This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/24/2023 at 05:38:41 (UTC).

EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY VS. RYAN LALLY

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RYAN LALLY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Employers Preferred Insurance Company

Defendant

Ryan Lally

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aires Law Firm

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13122687 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12950751.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13122687 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12950751.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: KNILL; Department: C17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 04/10/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13122687 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12950751.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31219965 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2022 05:16:20 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 10/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less