This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/18/2017 at 11:35:35 (UTC).

EMMA LOYA VS. DANIEL LEO WEISSBERG

Case Summary

On 03/13/2013 EMMA LOYA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DANIEL LEO WEISSBERG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUADALUPE GUZMAN

ELIO ANTONIO LOYA

EMMA LOYA

Defendants

ST. JOSEPH HERITAGE HEALTHCARE

WOMEN'S HEALTHCARE PHYSICIANS, INC.

MORAN, ROWEN & DORSEY INC.

ST. JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM

RAMAN K. CHOPRA

LISA VALLE, D.O., INC.

RENEE BALLENTINE, D.O.

PLAZA TOWERS OBSTETRICS & GYNECOLOGY

DANIEL LEO WEISSBERG

LISA VALLE

ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL

ST. JOSEPH HERITAGE MEDICAL GROUP

ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE

WOMEN'S HEALTHCARE PHYSICIANS, A MEDICAL CORPORATION

YORBA PARK MEDICAL GROUP II

RENEE BALLENTINE, M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

THE LAW OFFICE OF MICHELS & WATKINS

LAW OFFICES OF MICHELS & LEW

LA FOLLETTE, JOHNSON, DE HAAS, FESLER & AMES

CREASON & AARVIG, LLP

CARROLL, KELLY, TROTTER, FRANZEN, MCKENNA & PEABODY

BEAM BROBECK WEST BORGES & ROSA LLP

SCHMID & VOILES

DOYLE & MOORE, LLP

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD STOCKALPER & MOORE LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WEISSBERG, DANIEL LEO; MORAN, ROWEN & DORSEY INC. ON 06/04/2014

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WEISSBERG, DANIEL LEO; MORAN, ROWEN & DORSEY INC. ON 06/04/2014

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WEISSBERG, DANIEL LEO; MORAN, ROWEN & DORSEY INC. ON 06/04/2014

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WEISSBERG, DANIEL LEO; MORAN, ROWEN & DORSEY INC. ON 06/04/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE ON 05/22/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE ON 05/22/2014

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE ON 04/30/2014

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE ON 04/30/2014

ORDER - OTHER (DISMISSAL) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/28/2014

ORDER - OTHER (DISMISSAL) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/28/2014

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 04/28/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 04/28/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/24/2014 10:07:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/24/2014 10:07:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO ON 04/11/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO ON 04/11/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA ON 04/08/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA ON 04/08/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE ON 04/02/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE ON 04/02/2014

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4168542 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4168542 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA ON 04/01/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA ON 04/01/2014

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3129704 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3129704 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1153834 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1153834 REJECTED.

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2014

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2014

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY BALLENTINE, D.O., RENEE; ST. JOSEPH HERITAGE HEALTHCARE ON 02/25/2014

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY BALLENTINE, D.O., RENEE; ST. JOSEPH HERITAGE HEALTHCARE ON 02/25/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO ON 02/20/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO ON 02/20/2014

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WEISSBERG, DANIEL LEO; MORAN, ROWEN & DORSEY INC. ON 06/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WEISSBERG, DANIEL LEO; MORAN, ROWEN & DORSEY INC. ON 06/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2339990 RECEIVED ON 06/04/2014 11:25:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE ON 05/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4193756 RECEIVED ON 05/22/2014 08:23:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE ON 04/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2330237 RECEIVED ON 04/30/2014 10:57:46 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (DISMISSAL) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 04/28/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
170 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 175001 RECEIVED ON 03/20/2013 10:11:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. WILLIAM M. MONROE) FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO ON 03/19/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2227230 RECEIVED ON 03/19/2013 02:33:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MONROE, WILLIAM ON 03/13/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11334591 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11158483.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO ON 03/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO ON 03/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO ON 03/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LOYA, EMMA; GUZMAN, GUADALUPE; LOYA, ELIO ANTONIO ON 03/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2223048 RECEIVED ON 03/13/2013 04:59:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. JOSEPH HERITAGE MEDICAL GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE is a litigant

Latest cases where St. Joseph Heritage Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM is a litigant