This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 07:08:19 (UTC).

ELLIS JACKSON VS. THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 ELLIS JACKSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ellis Jackson

Matthew Jackson

Defendant

THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Messner Reeves LLP

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS ON 11/16/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS ON 11/16/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 11/16/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 11/16/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13134607 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12962678.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13134607 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12962678.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS ON 11/08/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS ON 11/08/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13130701 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12958772.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13130701 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12958772.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION ON 11/01/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION ON 11/01/2022

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 11/01/2022

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 11/01/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/28/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/28/2022 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS; JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 10/17/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS; JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 10/17/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION ON 10/13/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION ON 10/13/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13077761 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12905763.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13077761 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12905763.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION ON 07/05/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION ON 07/05/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13074355 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12902357.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13074355 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12902357.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION ON 07/07/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION ON 07/07/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/01/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION ON 07/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION ON 07/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 06/21/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 06/21/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 06/21/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 06/21/2022

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: SERVINO; Department: C21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41411790 RECEIVED ON 11/16/2022 12:31:17 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS ON 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13134607 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12962678.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS ON 11/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21232615 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2022 10:23:17 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13130701 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12958772.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE ILLUMINATION FOUNDATION ON 11/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31227153 RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022 12:44:55 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS; JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 04/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31139905 RECEIVED ON 04/04/2022 01:45:55 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/28/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 03/09/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13018713 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12846660.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS ON 03/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS ON 03/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS ON 03/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY JACKSON, ELLIS; JACKSON, MATTHEW ON 03/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21132063 RECEIVED ON 03/09/2022 02:21:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illumination Foundation is a litigant