This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 19:28:49 (UTC).

ELIZABETH GONZALEZ VS JULIAN ARELLANO

Case Summary

On 04/11/2017 ELIZABETH GONZALEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JULIAN ARELLANO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2946

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

Respondent

ARELLANO, JULIAN JAIME

 

Court Documents

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 04/11/2017 Amount:$435.00

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 04/11/2017 Amount:$435.00

SUMMONS 04/11/2017

SUMMONS 04/11/2017

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/11/2017

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/11/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 04/11/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 04/11/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 04/11/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 04/11/2017

ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 04/11/2017

ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 04/11/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/17/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/17/2017

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 06/07/2017

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 06/07/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 06/07/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 06/07/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 06/07/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 06/07/2017

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 06/07/2017

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 06/07/2017

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/07/2017 prelim

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/07/2017 prelim

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 06/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 06/07/2017

MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 06/12/2017

MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 06/12/2017

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 07/31/2017

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 07/31/2017

MINUTE ORDER 08/11/2017

MINUTE ORDER 08/11/2017

STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 08/11/2017

STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 08/11/2017

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 08/11/2017

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 08/11/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2017
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED; Department: L72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketHEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 08/11/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 08/11/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 07/31/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 06/12/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 06/07/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 06/07/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/07/2017 prelim; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 06/07/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/17/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 04/11/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 04/11/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/11/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 04/11/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 04/11/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketREQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 04/11/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 04/11/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less