This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:19:48 (UTC).

ELISA BELL VS THOMAS BELL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ELISA BELL filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against THOMAS BELL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LARSH, ERICK L. and WILSON, RENEE E.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1677

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judges

LARSH, ERICK L.

WILSON, RENEE E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BELL, ELISA M.

Respondent

BELL, THOMAS ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEMKIN, HOLLIE A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER 05/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • HEARING - MOTION - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • MOTION - OTHER 03/30/2016 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: BELL, THOMAS ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 03/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 03/18/2016; Filing Party: BELL, ELISA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 03/18/2016; Filing Party: BELL, ELISA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: BELL, ELISA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: BELL, ELISA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: BELL, ELISA M.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.