This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/08/2023 at 03:43:05 (UTC).

EKIAH PICKETT VS. JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 EKIAH PICKETT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ekiah Pickett

Defendant

Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Goldsmith West, A Professional Law Corporation

Defendant Attorney

Turner Henningsen Wolf & Vandenburg, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PICKETT, EKIAH ON 01/24/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY PICKETT, EKIAH ON 01/24/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PICKETT, EKIAH ON 01/24/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PICKETT, EKIAH ON 01/24/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PICKETT, EKIAH ON 01/24/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PICKETT, EKIAH ON 01/24/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13170705 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12998811.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13170705 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12998811.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N16 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N16 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC ON 03/01/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC ON 03/01/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13188648 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13016774.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13188648 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13016774.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GAFFNEY; Department: N16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13188648 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13016774.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31276105 RECEIVED ON 03/01/2023 11:31:49 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC ON 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N16 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13170705 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12998811.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41438889 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2023 03:19:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GAFFNEY, DONALD ON 01/24/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PICKETT, EKIAH ON 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PICKETT, EKIAH ON 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PICKETT, EKIAH ON 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less