Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 02:23:35 (UTC).

EDGAR GOMEZ ESPINOZA VS. MARIA FLORES

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 EDGAR GOMEZ ESPINOZA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARIA FLORES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edgar Gomez Espinoza

Defendants

First Financial Credit Union

Maria Flores

International Fidelity Insurance Company

Great American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Consumer Action Law Group, PC

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 07/17/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 07/17/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 07/17/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 07/17/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 06/19/2019

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 06/19/2019

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME) RECEIVED ON 06/12/2019.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME) RECEIVED ON 06/12/2019.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 06/13/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 06/13/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1629224 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1629224 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 06/05/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 06/05/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ESPINOZA, EDGAR GOMEZ FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12559818 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12383697.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ESPINOZA, EDGAR GOMEZ FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12559818 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12383697.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (DENIED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/17/2019

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (DENIED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/17/2019

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 05/15/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 05/15/2019.

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 05/15/2019.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 05/15/2019.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1645277 RECEIVED ON 07/17/2019 04:08:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME) RECEIVED ON 06/12/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1633122 RECEIVED ON 06/12/2019 12:57:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1633779 RECEIVED ON 06/13/2019 04:10:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1629224 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (DENIED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES DENIED IN WHOLE ON 05/17/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 05/15/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 05/15/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ ESPINOZA, EDGAR ON 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3791976 RECEIVED ON 05/15/2019 03:40:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant