This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 08:04:40 (UTC).

EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. VS. HARDY AND HARPER, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HARDY AND HARPER, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EBS Utilities Adjusting, Inc.

Defendant

Hardy and Harper, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Much Shelist, P.C.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13019958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12847905.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13019958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12847905.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/11/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/11/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/11/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/11/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/11/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/11/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/30/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/30/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 04/28/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 04/28/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 04/25/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 04/25/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 04/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1982145 RECEIVED ON 04/28/2022 02:00:31 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31148875 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2022 07:54:23 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 04/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41316562 RECEIVED ON 03/30/2022 11:42:17 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 03/11/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13019958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12847905.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC. ON 03/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31130708 RECEIVED ON 03/11/2022 02:43:41 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less