This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/17/2022 at 03:49:59 (UTC).

EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION VS. JOHN G MERCADO

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN G MERCADO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION

Defendant

JOHN G MERCADO

Anaheim, CA 92805-1221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anaya Law Group

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044273 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872289.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044273 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872289.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/04/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/04/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/04/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/04/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/04/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/04/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/16/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/16/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13069094 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12897090.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13069094 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12897090.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 06/27/2022

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 06/27/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/22/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/22/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/22/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/22/2022

JUDGMENT FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/23/2022

JUDGMENT FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/23/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/22/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/22/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11005078 RECEIVED ON 06/24/2022 02:10:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 06/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13069094 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12897090.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31171877 RECEIVED ON 06/22/2022 08:59:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 06/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1988993 RECEIVED ON 05/16/2022 01:37:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1984414 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2022 12:25:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY EAGLE COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION ON 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044273 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872289.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eagle Community Credit Union is a litigant