This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2017 at 09:20:30 (UTC).

DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. VS. ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2014 DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP filed an Other lawsuit against ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.

Defendants

THE GALAXY TRUST #1912, CIC AS TRUSTEE

ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINA

ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT HANSSLER

ANDRES, ANDRES & MOORE, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MARTIN & MCCORMICK APC

NASSIE LAW

Other Attorneys

THE LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT I. RICHARDS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 09/11/2015

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 09/11/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 09/08/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 09/08/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 08/24/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 08/24/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 08/24/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 08/24/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 08/21/2015 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 08/21/2015 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/14/2015 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/14/2015 10:00:00 AM.

SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF) FILED BY THE GALAXY TRUST #1912, CIC AS TRUSTEE ON 08/10/2015

SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF) FILED BY THE GALAXY TRUST #1912, CIC AS TRUSTEE ON 08/10/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 08/10/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 08/10/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/31/2015 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/31/2015 10:00:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY THE GALAXY TRUST #1912, CIC AS TRUSTEE ON 07/24/2015

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY THE GALAXY TRUST #1912, CIC AS TRUSTEE ON 07/24/2015

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY THE GALAXY TRUST #1912, CIC AS TRUSTEE ON 07/24/2015

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY THE GALAXY TRUST #1912, CIC AS TRUSTEE ON 07/24/2015

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2385247 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2385247 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 07/17/2015 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 07/17/2015 10:00:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 07/20/2015

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 07/20/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 07/20/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 07/20/2015

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 07/17/2015

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 07/17/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE GALAXY TRUST #1912, CIC AS TRUSTEE ON 07/16/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE GALAXY TRUST #1912, CIC AS TRUSTEE ON 07/16/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 07/16/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 07/16/2015

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 09/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3329980 RECEIVED ON 09/11/2015 10:31:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 09/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4432213 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2015 09:32:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 08/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP.; DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 08/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3323238 RECEIVED ON 08/24/2015 10:10:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 08/21/2015 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
172 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2014
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 03/26/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11565126 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11389001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 03/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3127193 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2014 12:39:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER COLAW, THIERRY ON 03/19/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11563755 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11387641.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 03/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 03/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY DYNGLOBAL CALIFORNIA CORP. ON 03/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4162193 RECEIVED ON 03/19/2014 11:57:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant