This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/13/2021 at 06:51:58 (UTC).

DREW HUNTHAUSEN VS. MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 DREW HUNTHAUSEN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Drew Hunthausen

Defendant

Medianews Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pacific Trial Attorneys

Defendant Attorney

Dentons US LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 09/30/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 09/30/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 09/30/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 09/30/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 09/30/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 09/30/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12951442 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12779347.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12951442 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12779347.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 11/03/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 11/03/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/03/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/03/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC. ON 11/04/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC. ON 11/04/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12967164 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12795087.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12967164 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12795087.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/06/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/06/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC. ON 12/06/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC. ON 12/06/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12979068 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12806987.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12979068 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12806987.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: W08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12979068 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12806987.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC. ON 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41271754 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2021 11:22:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12967164 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12795087.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31082289 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2021 05:43:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC. ON 11/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 11/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41260300 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2021 04:53:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12951442 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12779347.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21071591 RECEIVED ON 09/30/2021 12:27:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 09/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HUNTHAUSEN, DREW ON 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MediaNews Group, Inc. is a litigant