This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 07:44:05 (UTC).

DRAPERY WORKS, INC. VS. ON DECK CAPITAL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 DRAPERY WORKS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ON DECK CAPITAL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Drapery Works, Inc.

Gary Bloch

Defendants

Celtic Bank Corporation, a Utah Corporation

On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Maralan Law, P.C.

 

Court Documents

CASE REASSIGNED TO LON HURWITZ EFFECTIVE 07/16/2021.

CASE REASSIGNED TO LON HURWITZ EFFECTIVE 07/16/2021.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12900218 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12728014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12900218 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12728014.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DRAPERY WORKS, INC.; BLOCH, GARY ON 06/15/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DRAPERY WORKS, INC.; BLOCH, GARY ON 06/15/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DRAPERY WORKS, INC.; BLOCH, GARY ON 06/15/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DRAPERY WORKS, INC.; BLOCH, GARY ON 06/15/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY DRAPERY WORKS, INC.; BLOCH, GARY ON 06/15/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY DRAPERY WORKS, INC.; BLOCH, GARY ON 06/15/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MARGINES; Department: C20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO LON HURWITZ EFFECTIVE 07/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARGINES, CHARLES ON 06/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12900218 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12728014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DRAPERY WORKS, INC.; BLOCH, GARY ON 06/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DRAPERY WORKS, INC.; BLOCH, GARY ON 06/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DRAPERY WORKS, INC.; BLOCH, GARY ON 06/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21030331 RECEIVED ON 06/15/2021 10:53:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Celtic Bank Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where ON DECK CAPITAL INC. is a litigant