This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:28 (UTC).

DOUGLAS SHAPIRO VS. DOUGLAS B. VANDERPOOL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 DOUGLAS SHAPIRO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DOUGLAS B VANDERPOOL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOUGLAS SHAPIRO

Defendants

THE VANDERPOOL LAW FIRM, INC.

DOUGLAS B. VANDERPOOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SETH DAVIDSON

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 03/15/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927512 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751737.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927512 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751737.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION (COMPLAINT) FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 04/01/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION (COMPLAINT) FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 04/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 03/15/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION (COMPLAINT) FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 04/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3397973 RECEIVED ON 03/31/2016 12:24:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4517608 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016 12:30:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927512 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751737.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SHAPIRO, DOUGLAS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509495 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:49:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.