Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/05/2021 at 06:41:48 (UTC).

DONYE MITCHELL VS. WINDRIDGE APARTMENTS

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 DONYE MITCHELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WINDRIDGE APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donye Mitchell

Defendants and Others

Equity Residential Management, LLC

Windridge Apartments

Four Seasons Landscape And Property Services

Four Seasons Landscape and Property Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Office of Steven Zwick

Defendant and Other Attorneys

Prindle, Goetz, Barnes & Reinholtz LLP

Law Office of Eric G. Anderson

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12907292 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12735131.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12907292 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12735131.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/30/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/30/2021

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/30/2021

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/30/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12897870 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12725677.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12897870 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12725677.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FOUR SEASONS LANDSCAPE AND PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. ON 06/04/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FOUR SEASONS LANDSCAPE AND PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. ON 06/04/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FOUR SEASONS LANDSCAPE AND PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. ON 06/04/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FOUR SEASONS LANDSCAPE AND PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. ON 06/04/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12877916 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12705655.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12877916 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12705655.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MITCHELL, DONYE ON 04/22/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MITCHELL, DONYE ON 04/22/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MITCHELL, DONYE ON 04/22/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MITCHELL, DONYE ON 04/22/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MITCHELL, DONYE ON 04/22/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MITCHELL, DONYE ON 04/22/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MARKS; Department: C25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12907292 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12735131.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21036374 RECEIVED ON 06/30/2021 01:22:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 06/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12897870 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12725677.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1855242 RECEIVED ON 06/04/2021 01:46:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FOUR SEASONS LANDSCAPE AND PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. ON 06/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FOUR SEASONS LANDSCAPE AND PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. ON 06/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12877916 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12705655.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1838926 RECEIVED ON 04/22/2021 05:17:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 04/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MITCHELL, DONYE ON 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MITCHELL, DONYE ON 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MITCHELL, DONYE ON 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equity Residential Management LLC is a litigant