This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 06:17:25 (UTC).

DONNA WOODWORTH VS. CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 DONNA WOODWORTH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donna Woodworth

James Vale

Defendants

Brightview Holdings, Inc.

City of Laguna Beach

Brightview Landscape Services

Montage Laguna Beach, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Ted B. Wacker

Defendant Attorneys

Bordin Semmer LLP

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

Law Office of Tracey Lazarus

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/12/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/12/2022 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12989342 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12817261.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12989342 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12817261.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 12/30/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 12/30/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 12/28/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 12/28/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH ON 12/28/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH ON 12/28/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES ON 12/27/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES ON 12/27/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 12/20/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 12/20/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12985054 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12812975.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12985054 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12812975.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 12/20/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 12/20/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12934369 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12762268.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12934369 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12762268.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH ON 08/24/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH ON 08/24/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927620 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755481.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927620 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755481.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH ON 08/09/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH ON 08/09/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH ON 08/09/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH ON 08/09/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12925597 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12753454.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12925597 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12753454.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES ON 08/05/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES ON 08/05/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES ON 08/05/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES ON 08/05/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 07/09/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 07/09/2021

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/12/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/20/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/21/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/20/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/21/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12989342 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12817261.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21105227 RECEIVED ON 12/30/2021 03:01:49 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 12/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 07/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21039828 RECEIVED ON 07/09/2021 03:56:49 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/12/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12906395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12734214.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1864519 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2021 11:08:13 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 06/29/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 06/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 06/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 06/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY WOODWORTH, DONNA; VALE, JAMES ON 06/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less