This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 06:37:43 (UTC).

DONALD M. HORNING VS. FORD MOTOR COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 DONALD M HORNING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donald M. Horning

Hope K. Horning

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Ford Motor Company, Inc.

Caruso Ford

Long Beach Lincoln Mercury, Inc.

Ford Motor Company

Defendant and Other

Long Beach Lincoln Mercury, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Michael S. Humphries

Defendant and Other Attorneys

Chapman, Glucksman, Dean & Roeb

Sanders Roberts LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HORNING, DONALD M.; HORNING, HOPE K. ON 02/03/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HORNING, DONALD M.; HORNING, HOPE K. ON 02/03/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/20/2021 03:21:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/20/2021 03:21:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865562 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693241.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865562 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693241.

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 03/05/2021

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 03/05/2021

CASE REASSIGNED TO MELISSA MCCORMICK EFFECTIVE 01/04/2021.

CASE REASSIGNED TO MELISSA MCCORMICK EFFECTIVE 01/04/2021.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 10/30/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 10/30/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) VOIDED ON 10/26/2020.

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) VOIDED ON 10/26/2020.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 10/13/2020

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 10/13/2020

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

PAYMENT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12782174 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. EF#3936455 VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD

PAYMENT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12782174 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. EF#3936455 VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12782174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12608922.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12782174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12608922.

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 09/14/2020

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 09/14/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12773654 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12600290.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12773654 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12600290.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 08/19/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 08/19/2020

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 08/19/2020

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 08/19/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 08/19/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 08/19/2020

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31116005 RECEIVED ON 02/03/2022 01:48:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HORNING, DONALD M.; HORNING, HOPE K. ON 02/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/31/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL CONTINUED TO 05/31/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/20/2021 03:21:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3987597 RECEIVED ON 03/05/2021 11:59:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865562 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693241.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 08/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 08/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY, INC. ON 08/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41096881 RECEIVED ON 07/09/2020 04:28:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12758012 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12584386.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HORNING, DONALD M.; HORNING, HOPE K. ON 07/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HORNING, DONALD M.; HORNING, HOPE K. ON 07/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HORNING, DONALD M.; HORNING, HOPE K. ON 07/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 07/09/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant