This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/28/2022 at 07:15:48 (UTC).

DONALD M. BRONSTEIN VS. REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 DONALD M BRONSTEIN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARSON LEVIT, TRUSTEE OF THE LEVIT FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST

DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE DON AND CHERYL BRONSTEIN FAMILY TRUST, ACCOUNT 125

DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE KIMBERLY BRONSTEIN LIVING TRUST

DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE NICOLE BRONSTEIN LIVING TRUST

Donald M. Bronstein

IRA SERVICES TRUST COMPANY, CUSTODIAN FBO DONALD M. BRONSTEIN IRA

IRA SERVICES TRUST COMPANY, CUSTODIAN

Defendants

ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY

ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA

REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Buchalter, A Professional Corporation

Defendant Attorney

Wayte & Carruth LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13011996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12839945.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13011996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12839945.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/22/2022.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/22/2022.

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF JAMES P. WAGONER) FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF JAMES P. WAGONER) FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 02/22/2022.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 02/22/2022.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13011832 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12839781.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13011832 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12839781.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13011801 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12839750.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13011801 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12839750.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/22/2022.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/22/2022.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF JAMES P. WAGONER) FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF JAMES P. WAGONER) FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

MOTION TO STRIKE (PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT) FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

MOTION TO STRIKE (PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT) FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/23/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/23/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/23/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/23/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/23/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/23/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2022

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY; ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/22/2022

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: WILSON; Department: CX102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; Judge: WILSON; Department: CX102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; Judge: WILSON; Department: CX102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT; Judge: WILSON; Department: CX102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13011996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12839945.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21125724 RECEIVED ON 02/22/2022 07:28:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13011832 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12839781.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31123093 RECEIVED ON 02/22/2022 05:36:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY BRONSTEIN, DONALD M. ON 01/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1936048 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2022 04:59:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY BRONSTEIN, DONALD M. ON 01/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41282329 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2022 04:59:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12985937 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12813858.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21100625 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2021 12:20:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 12/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRONSTEIN, DONALD M.; CARSON LEVIT, TRUSTEE OF THE LEVIT FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST; DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE DON AND CHERYL BRONSTEIN FAMILY TRUST, ACCOUNT 125; DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE KIMBERLY BRONSTEIN LIVING TRUST; DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE NICOLE BRONSTEIN LIVING TRUST; IRA SERVICES TRUST COMPANY, CUSTODIAN FBO DONALD M. BRONSTEIN IRA ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRONSTEIN, DONALD M.; CARSON LEVIT, TRUSTEE OF THE LEVIT FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST; DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE DON AND CHERYL BRONSTEIN FAMILY TRUST, ACCOUNT 125; DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE KIMBERLY BRONSTEIN LIVING TRUST; DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE NICOLE BRONSTEIN LIVING TRUST; IRA SERVICES TRUST COMPANY, CUSTODIAN FBO DONALD M. BRONSTEIN IRA ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BRONSTEIN, DONALD M.; CARSON LEVIT, TRUSTEE OF THE LEVIT FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST; DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE DON AND CHERYL BRONSTEIN FAMILY TRUST, ACCOUNT 125; DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE KIMBERLY BRONSTEIN LIVING TRUST; DONALD M. BRONSTEIN, TRUSTEE OF THE NICOLE BRONSTEIN LIVING TRUST; IRA SERVICES TRUST COMPANY, CUSTODIAN FBO DONALD M. BRONSTEIN IRA ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant