This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/15/2017 at 06:34:46 (UTC).

DON T. KOJIMA VS. KEVIN B. KELLY

Case Summary

On 11/15/2012 DON T KOJIMA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KEVIN B KELLY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DON T. KOJIMA

SUSAN Z. KOJIMA

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

KEVIN B. KELLY

KELLY CONSTRUCTION

KEVIN B KELLY

COASTAL ROOFING COMPANY, INC.

C R AND SONS, INC.

NEWPORT CUSTOM WOODWORKING

MURRAY SCOTT CONSTRUCTION

SILLARS CONSTRUCTION

RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC.

SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION, INC.

BOYER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS

TIM CAGLE DRYWALL

ABOVE IT ALL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

CONTEMPORARY AIR CONTROL, INC.

LUTE'S DECKING COMPANY

KELLY'S PLUMBING, INC.

STUDIO CAST DESIGNS, INC.

COAST BUILDERS

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Others

KEVIN B KELLY

COASTAL ROOFING COMPANY, INC.

C R AND SONS, INC.

NEWPORT CUSTOM WOODWORKING

MURRAY SCOTT CONSTRUCTION

SILLARS CONSTRUCTION

RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC.

SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION, INC.

BOYER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS

TIM CAGLE DRYWALL

ABOVE IT ALL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

CONTEMPORARY AIR CONTROL, INC.

LUTE'S DECKING COMPANY

KELLY'S PLUMBING, INC.

STUDIO CAST DESIGNS, INC.

COAST BUILDERS

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOJIC & LIVESAY LLP

Defendant, Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND LLP

MENEKSHE LAW FIRM

SKANE WILCOX LLP

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

MEYERS FOZI, LLP

KRING & CHUNG LLP

LAW OFFICES OF KEVING PEGAN

PATRICK J HOOLIHAN LAW CORPORATION

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

MURCHISON & CUMMING, LLP

SALTARELLI LAW CORPORATION

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D. COHEN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER (CONFIRMING SETTLEMENT) FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 08/11/2014

ORDER - OTHER (CONFIRMING SETTLEMENT) FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 08/11/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 07/11/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 07/11/2014

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 07/11/2014

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 07/11/2014

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 07/11/2014

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 07/11/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY NEWPORT CUSTOM WOODWORKING ON 07/02/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY NEWPORT CUSTOM WOODWORKING ON 07/02/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 06/04/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 06/04/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 04/04/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 04/04/2014

RESPONSE (COMPLIANCE WITH CMO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, EXHIBIT "E") FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 03/13/2014

RESPONSE (COMPLIANCE WITH CMO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, EXHIBIT "E") FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 03/13/2014

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY C R AND SONS, INC. ON 03/03/2014

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY C R AND SONS, INC. ON 03/03/2014

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4146837 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4146837 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 02/13/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RUPERT BRIGGS SHEET METAL, INC. ON 02/13/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11508214 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11331997.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11508214 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11331997.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY COASTAL ROOFING COMPANY, INC. ON 09/17/2013

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY COASTAL ROOFING COMPANY, INC. ON 09/17/2013

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BOYER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS ON 05/29/2013

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BOYER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS ON 05/29/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 06/03/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 06/03/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11365203 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11189095.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11365203 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11189095.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWPORT CUSTOM WOODWORKING ON 05/07/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWPORT CUSTOM WOODWORKING ON 05/07/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 11/15/2012

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 11/15/2012

165 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2015
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 08/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1273452 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2015 11:31:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SILLARS CONSTRUCTION ON 07/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY SILLARS CONSTRUCTION ON 07/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2393450 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2015 04:31:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
284 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KOJIMA, SUSAN Z.; KOJIMA, DON T. ON 11/29/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 129038 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2012 03:39:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KOJIMA, SUSAN Z.; KOJIMA, DON T. ON 11/29/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2165579 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2012 03:33:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ANDLER, GAIL ON 11/15/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11264478 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11088370.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 11/15/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 11/15/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KOJIMA, DON T.; KOJIMA, SUSAN Z. ON 11/15/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2161661 RECEIVED ON 11/15/2012 02:47:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KELLY'S PLUMBING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kellye Construction (Berry Kephart) is a litigant