This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:06 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS VS. GALDINO LUCERO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GALDINO LUCERO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS

Defendant

GALDINO LUCERO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS ON 03/29/2017; Filing Party: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS ON 03/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CAR-ROS SERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12027927 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11851927.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS ON 08/25/2016; Filing Party: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS ON 08/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS ON 05/26/2016; Filing Party: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 05/26/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS ON 03/28/2016; Filing Party: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS ON 03/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11926998 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/26/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.