This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/01/2020 at 20:07:45 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC VS. DANIEL VENTURA

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIEL VENTURA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC

Defendant

DANIEL VENTURA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC ON 02/26/2020; Filing Party: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 02/26/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SMALL CLAIMS FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC ON 01/16/2020; Filing Party: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC ON 01/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12680462 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12505281.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/26/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C62 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC ON 12/18/2019; Filing Party: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC ON 12/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less