This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 03:00:56 (UTC).

DOMINICK MARTIN VS. SEQUENTIAL BRANDS GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 DOMINICK MARTIN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SEQUENTIAL BRANDS GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOMINICK MARTIN

ABELARDO MARTINEZ JR

ABELARDO MARTINEZ

Defendant

SEQUENTIAL BRANDS GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PACIFIC TRIAL ATTORNEYS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR; MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 05/02/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR; MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 05/02/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/29/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/29/2019 08:30:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/14/2019 02:40:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/14/2019 02:40:00 PM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR; MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/22/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR; MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/22/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/20/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/20/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 01/23/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 01/23/2019

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 12/19/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 12/19/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12473233 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12296932.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12473233 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12296932.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 12/19/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 12/19/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 12/19/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 12/19/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 12/19/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 12/19/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR; MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1618935 RECEIVED ON 05/02/2019 10:07:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/29/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE CONTINUED TO 05/28/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/28/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/14/2019 02:40:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C26.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2765825 RECEIVED ON 02/22/2019 02:39:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/20/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3751542 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2019 12:21:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 12/19/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12473233 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12296932.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 12/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 12/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK; MARTINEZ, ABELARDO JR ON 12/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1572841 RECEIVED ON 12/19/2018 03:35:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEQUENTIAL BRANDS GROUP is a litigant