Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 07:15:21 (UTC).

DOMINICK MARTIN VS. MYLAN INC.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 DOMINICK MARTIN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MYLAN INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dominick Martin

Defendant

Mylan Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pacific Trial Attorneys

 

Court Documents

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 06/09/2021

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 06/09/2021

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/15/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/15/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/09/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/09/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1809710 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1809710 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1809426 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1809426 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12839991 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12667506.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12839991 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12667506.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/02/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/02/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/02/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/02/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/02/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/02/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: GEORGE; Department: C24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 06/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21027985 RECEIVED ON 06/09/2021 10:08:11 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/15/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41157288 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2021 12:03:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1809710 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1809426 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12839991 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12667506.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1808859 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2021 01:06:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GEORGE, STEPHANIE ON 02/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MARTIN, DOMINICK ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MYLAN INC is a litigant