This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/01/2022 at 03:51:56 (UTC).

DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT VS. BONADIMAN WATER, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BONADIMAN WATER, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Division of Labor Standards Enforcement

Defendants

Bonadiman Water, Inc.

Martinez Concrete, Inc.

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT ON 08/19/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT ON 08/19/2022

REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT ON 08/19/2022

REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT ON 08/19/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21211609 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21211609 REJECTED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21211609 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11034349 RECEIVED ON 09/02/2022 01:23:29 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41374315 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2022 01:00:02 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketREQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT ON 08/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT ON 08/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT is a litigant