This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 02:24:19 (UTC).

DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC VS. NELL HENDON

Case Summary

On 03/04/2016 DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against NELL HENDON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC

Defendants

E MANAGEMENT CONSULTING

VICTORIA HENDON

MARIA BARKER

ELLIS RUBENSTEIN

JACKSON FOOD STORES, INC.

NELL HENDON

HEATHER HENDON

JAY SWART

KELLY CARROLL

VERDE AUTO SERVICES, LLC

GIL OLGUIN

BURCH & CRACCHIOLO

ERNIE GARCIA

PUDENTIAL METAL AND STEEL SUPPLY, LLC

VERDE INVESTMENTS, INC.

EQUILON ENTERPRISES, LLC

PACWEST ENERGY, LLC

ALAN MEDA

CHRIS ALVAREZ

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WILSON KEADJIAN BROWNDORF LLP

Defendant Attorneys

HORVITZ & LEVY LLP

HAWLEY TROXELL ENNIS & HAWLEY LLP

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (AMENDMENT) FILED BY JACKSON FOOD STORES, INC.; PACWEST ENERGY, LLC; EQUILON ENTERPRISES, LLC ON 05/11/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (AMENDMENT) FILED BY JACKSON FOOD STORES, INC.; PACWEST ENERGY, LLC; EQUILON ENTERPRISES, LLC ON 05/11/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11964016 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11788161.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11964016 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11788161.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY HENDON, NELL; HENDON, HEATHER; HENDON, VICTORIA ON 05/03/2016

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY HENDON, NELL; HENDON, HEATHER; HENDON, VICTORIA ON 05/03/2016

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY JACKSON FOOD STORES, INC. ON 05/02/2016

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY JACKSON FOOD STORES, INC. ON 05/02/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11962385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11786524.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11962385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11786524.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PACWEST ENERGY, LLC ON 05/02/2016

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PACWEST ENERGY, LLC ON 05/02/2016

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PACWEST ENERGY, LLC ON 05/02/2016

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PACWEST ENERGY, LLC ON 05/02/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11962373 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11786512.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11962373 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11786512.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PACWEST ENERGY, LLC ON 04/28/2016

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PACWEST ENERGY, LLC ON 04/28/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11960980 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11785119.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11960980 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11785119.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY EQUILON ENTERPRISES, LLC ON 04/28/2016

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY EQUILON ENTERPRISES, LLC ON 04/28/2016

PAYMENT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11959684 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

PAYMENT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11959684 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11959684 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11783809.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11959684 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11783809.

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY OLGUIN, GIL ON 04/06/2016

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY OLGUIN, GIL ON 04/06/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC ON 03/04/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC ON 03/04/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC ON 03/04/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC ON 03/04/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC ON 03/04/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC ON 03/04/2016

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/16/2016 02:58:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • THE CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE OMNIBUS CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 05/16/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (AMENDMENT) FILED BY JACKSON FOOD STORES, INC.; PACWEST ENERGY, LLC; EQUILON ENTERPRISES, LLC ON 05/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4545752 RECEIVED ON 05/11/2016 09:29:46 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11964016 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11788161.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY HENDON, NELL; HENDON, HEATHER; HENDON, VICTORIA ON 05/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3409741 RECEIVED ON 05/03/2016 04:23:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2016 AT 10:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11949519 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11773672.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY OLGUIN, GIL ON 04/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4529691 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016 10:44:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 03/04/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11931563 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11755748.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC ON 03/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC ON 03/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY DIVERSIFIED FUNDING GROUP, LLC ON 03/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4513000 RECEIVED ON 03/04/2016 12:59:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURCH AND CRACCHIOLO P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where JACKSONS FOOD STORES, INC., a Nevada corporation, AKA Jacksons of Idaho is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUILON ENTERPRISES, LLC. DBA SHELL OIL COMPANY is a litigant