This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/31/2020 at 06:53:33 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. ROGER F HICKS

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROGER F HICKS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Roger F Hicks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zwicker & Associates

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/18/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/18/2019

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 12/02/2019

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 12/02/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 01/27/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 01/27/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/18/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/18/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED SUBMITTED BY DISCOVER BANK REJECTED ON 11/18/2019.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED SUBMITTED BY DISCOVER BANK REJECTED ON 11/18/2019.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/18/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/18/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12661491 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12486172.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12661491 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12486172.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/19/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/19/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41059418 RECEIVED ON 01/27/2020 03:17:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1693899 RECEIVED ON 12/02/2019 01:37:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41036058 RECEIVED ON 11/19/2019 07:44:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED SUBMITTED BY DISCOVER BANK REJECTED ON 11/18/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12661491 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12486172.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2860829 RECEIVED ON 11/18/2019 09:28:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.