Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 03:25:35 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. RICARDO V GALINDO

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RICARDO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendants

Ricardo V Galindo Sr

RICARDO V GALINDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Suttell & Hammer, APC

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/08/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/08/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/02/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/02/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12840017 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12667532.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12840017 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12667532.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1819913 RECEIVED ON 03/08/2021 02:37:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3986229 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2021 02:08:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12840017 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12667532.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1808957 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2021 03:12:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant