This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 06:48:53 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. CHRISTOPHER M HYLTON

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER M HYLTON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Christopher M Hylton

Ladera Ranch, CA 92694-1118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Moore Law Group, APC

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/10/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 08/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 08/10/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910936 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738812.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910936 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738812.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 07/09/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 07/09/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 07/09/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 07/09/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 07/09/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 07/09/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41239103 RECEIVED ON 09/10/2021 03:44:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 09/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 08/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1880435 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2021 10:32:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910936 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738812.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31036630 RECEIVED ON 07/09/2021 09:13:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant