This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/29/2022 at 03:40:54 (UTC).

DINO SOAVE VS. CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 DINO SOAVE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dino Soave

Defendant

Cadence Aerospace, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Radcliff Mayes LLP

Defendant Attorney

Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/24/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/24/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13022185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12850170.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13022185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12850170.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/16/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/16/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/16/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/16/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/16/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/16/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/29/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/29/2022

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/29/2022

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/29/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13043828 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12871844.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13043828 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12871844.

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 04/27/2022

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 04/27/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 04/27/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 04/27/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 04/27/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 04/27/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/27/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/27/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MARKS; Department: C25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; Judge: MARKS; Department: C25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1981739 RECEIVED ON 04/27/2022 05:31:47 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13043828 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12871844.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1981738 RECEIVED ON 04/27/2022 05:31:45 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 04/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21152492 RECEIVED ON 04/27/2022 05:31:47 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 04/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21140172 RECEIVED ON 03/29/2022 01:37:12 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41310674 RECEIVED ON 03/16/2022 06:44:18 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13022185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12850170.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/24/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOAVE, DINO ON 03/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 03/16/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cadence Aerospace LLC is a litigant