This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/08/2020 at 06:44:22 (UTC).

DICKENSON COMMERCIAL ENTERPRISES VS. RICK AKLES

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 DICKENSON COMMERCIAL ENTERPRISES filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against RICK AKLES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DICKENSON COMMERCIAL ENTERPRISES

Defendant

Rick Akles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VINCENT REAL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY DICKENSON COMMERCIAL ENTERPRISES ON 05/26/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY DICKENSON COMMERCIAL ENTERPRISES ON 05/26/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12733152 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12559411.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12733152 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12559411.

PAYMENT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER), TRANSACTION NUMBER 12733152 IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD.

PAYMENT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER), TRANSACTION NUMBER 12733152 IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD.

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

COMPLAINT VOIDED ON 07/09/2020.

COMPLAINT VOIDED ON 07/09/2020.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT VOIDED ON 07/09/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL- NSF/FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL- NSF/FEE WAIVER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER), TRANSACTION NUMBER 12733152 IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12733152 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12559411.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2904331 RECEIVED ON 03/19/2020 12:43:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DICKENSON COMMERCIAL ENTERPRISES ON 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REAL, VINCENT