This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:30 (UTC).

DIANE CHOW VS. SUREFIRE, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 DIANE CHOW filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SUREFIRE, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIANE CHOW

Defendants

GREG JIGAMIAN

SUREFIRE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AITKEN CAMPBELL HEIKAUS WEAVER, LLP

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JIGAMIAN, GREG; SUREFIRE, LLC ON 06/08/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JIGAMIAN, GREG; SUREFIRE, LLC ON 06/08/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11980909 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11804989.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11980909 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11804989.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927330 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751555.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927330 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751555.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/21/2016 10:07:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/21/2016 10:07:00 AM.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 02/26/2016.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 07/20/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 07/20/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 07/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4578510 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2016 08:00:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/21/2016 10:07:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11980909 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11804989.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JIGAMIAN, GREG; SUREFIRE, LLC ON 06/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4559082 RECEIVED ON 06/08/2016 02:30:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927330 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751555.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CHOW, DIANE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306953 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:35:08 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.