This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/14/2017 at 13:15:54 (UTC).

DIANA MOORE VS SCOTT CHRISTIAN

Case Summary

On 08/01/2017 DIANA MOORE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SCOTT CHRISTIAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER, FRANZ E.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6302

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER, FRANZ E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MOORE, DIANA

Respondent

CHRISTIAN, SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'NEIL, MICHAEL ROBERT

Respondent Attorney

HOLSTROM BLOCK & PARKE APLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • HEARING - RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • HEARING - RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/20/2017; Filing Party: CHRISTIAN, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 09/20/2017; Filing Party: CHRISTIAN, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 09/20/2017; Filing Party: CHRISTIAN, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 09/20/2017; Filing Party: CHRISTIAN, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 09/12/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: CHRISTIAN, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/12/2017; Filing Party: CHRISTIAN, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/12/2017; Filing Party: CHRISTIAN, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 08/14/2017 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/07/2017; Filing Party: MOORE, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTY FEES 08/07/2017 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: MOORE, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/01/2017; Filing Party: MOORE, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • SUMMONS 08/01/2017; Filing Party: MOORE, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/01/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MOORE, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael R O'Neil