This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 03:47:48 (UTC).

DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. VS. C3 LIGHTING SOLUTIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 DHL EXPRESS USA , INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against C3 LIGHTING SOLUTIONS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DHL Express (USA), Inc.

Defendant

C3 Lighting Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gaba Law

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13072657 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12900659.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13072657 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12900659.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/05/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/05/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/05/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/05/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/05/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/05/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/22/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/22/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (PROPOSED JUDGMENT; DECLARATIONS; REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL) FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (PROPOSED JUDGMENT; DECLARATIONS; REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL) FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (SUMMARY OF CASE) FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (SUMMARY OF CASE) FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585; INTEREST; WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES) FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585; INTEREST; WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES) FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

JUDGMENT FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

JUDGMENT FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31201844 RECEIVED ON 09/01/2022 12:35:36 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585; INTEREST; WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES) FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (SUMMARY OF CASE) FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (PROPOSED JUDGMENT; DECLARATIONS; REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL) FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11016216 RECEIVED ON 07/22/2022 11:11:51 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41354643 RECEIVED ON 07/05/2022 01:05:28 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13072657 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12900659.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. ON 07/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DHL EXPRESS is a litigant