This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/24/2023 at 18:41:14 (UTC).

DESIREE PATNO VS. CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 DESIREE PATNO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Desiree Patno

Jay Jones

Defendants

Bartwood Construction, Inc.

Crestbrook Insurance Company

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Regina Spurley

Defendant Attorneys

Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara LLP

Hines Hampton Pelanda, LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13157028 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12985125.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13157028 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12985125.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PATNO, DESIREE; JONES, JAY ON 12/28/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PATNO, DESIREE; JONES, JAY ON 12/28/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PATNO, DESIREE; JONES, JAY ON 12/28/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PATNO, DESIREE; JONES, JAY ON 12/28/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BARTWOOD CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 12/28/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BARTWOOD CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 12/28/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13155458 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12983555.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13155458 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12983555.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/21/2022.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/21/2022.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BARTWOOD CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 12/21/2022

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BARTWOOD CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 12/21/2022

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • HearingDescription: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; Judge: RECIO; Department: W08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: RECIO; Department: W08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41438003 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2023 10:38:40 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31259469 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2023 09:17:31 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21262264 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2023 09:17:30 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CRESTBROOK INSURANCE COMPANY; NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41437938 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2023 09:17:45 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DEREK W. HUNT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO DEREK HUNT EFFECTIVE 08/09/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/09/2022 09:37:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13034887 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12862908.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31144137 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2022 07:39:37 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 04/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PATNO, DESIREE; JONES, JAY ON 04/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PATNO, DESIREE; JONES, JAY ON 04/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PATNO, DESIREE; JONES, JAY ON 04/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less