This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 10:29:01 (UTC).

DESIREE IRVIN VS. CITY OF HUNTINGTON BEACH

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 DESIREE IRVIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF HUNTINGTON BEACH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DESIREE IRVIN

PAUL BAEYENS

Defendants

HOWARD KEN NAHASHIOYA

ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

WINSTON WHITNEY

CITY OF HUNTINGTON BEACH

PAULA GONELLA

HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP

AFSHIN A. MASHOOF

TALBERT MEDICAL GROUP

JOHN G. LIEU

SON NGUYEN

VIET M. HUYNH

DARRYL RICHARDS

SHAWN LOCKER

WILLIAM PARK

KHANH H. LE

PASCAL JUANG

FAYE TOWLIAT

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMBERS NORONHA & KUBOTA

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL E. GATES

NEAL MOORE

Other Attorneys

Wesierski and Zurek LLP

Michael Maguire & Associates

LAW OFFICES OF CHAMBERS & NORONHA

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO OKADA; FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO OKADA; FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/31/2019

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 02/22/2019

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 02/22/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12497372 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12321071.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12497372 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12321071.

MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO OKADA; FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/31/2019

MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO OKADA; FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/31/2019

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO OKADA; FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/31/2019

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO OKADA; FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/31/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BAEYENS, PAUL ON 02/04/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BAEYENS, PAUL ON 02/04/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE ON 02/04/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE ON 02/04/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED.) FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 11/30/2018

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED.) FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 11/30/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/17/2019 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/17/2019 01:30:00 PM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO OKADA; FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/18/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO OKADA; FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/18/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/16/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/16/2019 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12482887 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12306586.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12482887 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12306586.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE ON 01/15/2019

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE ON 01/15/2019

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/08/2019

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/08/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/03/2019 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/03/2019 01:30:00 PM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MORRISON, DEBRA ELAYNE ON 01/03/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MORRISON, DEBRA ELAYNE ON 01/03/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE; BAEYENS, PAUL ON 01/03/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE; BAEYENS, PAUL ON 01/03/2019

174 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO OKADA; FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2758137 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2019 04:35:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1594418 RECEIVED ON 02/22/2019 04:44:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR 03/07/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12497372 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12321071.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO OKADA; FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY FLOYD, SUENO OKADA; FLOYD, SUENO C.; ESTATE OF WILLIAM LEONARD FLOYD ON 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4932907 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2019 04:35:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
283 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE; BAEYENS, PAUL ON 04/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE; BAEYENS, PAUL ON 04/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE; BAEYENS, PAUL ON 04/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1379062 RECEIVED ON 04/12/2017 04:12:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 03/29/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12131401 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11955216.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE; BAEYENS, PAUL ON 03/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE; BAEYENS, PAUL ON 03/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVIN, DESIREE; BAEYENS, PAUL ON 03/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4700406 RECEIVED ON 03/29/2017 09:05:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TALBERT MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP A COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION; COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF LONG BEACH A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION; is a litigant