This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:26:10 (UTC).

DESIREE FEHMIE VS. KRISTINA FEHMIE-LINK

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 DESIREE FEHMIE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KRISTINA FEHMIE-LINK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DESIREE FEHMIE

Defendants

KRISTINA FEHMIE-LINK

SYDNEY NICOLE LINK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURINGER LAW GROUP, PLC

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/30/2017

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 11/22/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 11/22/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/10/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3610280 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3610280 REJECTED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/10/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/30/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/30/2017

PROPOSED JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE REJECTED ON 08/01/2018.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE REJECTED ON 08/01/2018.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/31/2017) RECEIVED ON 10/30/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/31/2017) RECEIVED ON 10/30/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE REJECTED ON 12/05/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE REJECTED ON 12/05/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/24/2018.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/24/2018.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/04/2017 11:22:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/04/2017 11:22:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/30/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/30/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/10/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/31/2018 01:44:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/31/2018 01:44:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12245435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12069175.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12245435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12069175.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE REJECTED ON 08/01/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/31/2018 01:44:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/24/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3691434 RECEIVED ON 07/24/2018 03:42:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE REJECTED ON 12/05/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/04/2017 11:22:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1435446 RECEIVED ON 10/30/2017 09:28:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4778922 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2017 03:10:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233355 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057035.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FEHMIE, DESIREE ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2600603 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 01:05:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.