This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:32:44 (UTC).

DEREK WORDEN VS. THEODORA ORINGHER, PC

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 DEREK WORDEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THEODORA ORINGHER, PC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEREK WORDEN

Defendant

THEODORA ORINGHER, PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID H. PIERCE & ASSOCIATES PC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12578380 AND RECEIPT NUM

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12578380 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12402388.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 06/27/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 06/27/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/07/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/07/2019 09:00:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER - OTHER (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/06/2019

ORDER - OTHER (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/06/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 06/12/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 06/12/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 06/10/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 06/10/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12563398 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12387317.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12563398 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12387317.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/23/2019.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/23/2019.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 05/24/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 05/24/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/07/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/07/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12544166 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12367998.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12544166 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12367998.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/11/2019.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/11/2019.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/11/2019.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/11/2019.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 04/11/2019

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 04/11/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/02/2019 12:44:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/02/2019 12:44:00 PM.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12578380 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12402388.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1638469 RECEIVED ON 06/27/2019 10:50:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/07/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 06/28/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION. PLAINTIFF TO PAY FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/28/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2777676 RECEIVED ON 03/27/2019 12:27:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/05/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 02/27/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12508288 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12332007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WORDEN, DEREK ON 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1595763 RECEIVED ON 02/27/2019 11:51:05 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THEODORA ORINGHER PC is a litigant