This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 16:58:02 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING VS. PATHWAYS COMMUNITY SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PATHWAYS COMMUNITY SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Department of Fair Employment and Housing

Defendants

Pathways Health and Community Support, LLC

Pathways Community Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Denise Y. Levey

Francisco V. Balderrama

Irina Trasovan

Paula D. Pearlman

Melanie Proctor

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/30/2020 02:38:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/30/2020 02:38:00 PM.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 07/23/2020

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 07/23/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2020 09:11:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2020 09:11:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING; DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING; DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING; DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 07/16/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING; DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING; DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING; DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 07/16/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 07/16/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 07/16/2020

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 07/06/2020

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 07/06/2020

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/30/2020 03:03:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/30/2020 03:03:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/30/2020 02:10:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/30/2020 02:10:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 06/26/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 06/26/2020

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 06/25/2020

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 06/25/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 06/24/2020

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 06/24/2020

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCASE CONSOLIDATED ON 07/31/2020. 30-2018-01039657-CU-CR-CJC IS DESIGNATED THE LEAD CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/30/2020 02:38:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERS THE FOLLOWING CASES CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES: . THE COURT DESIGNATES AS THE LEAD CASE AND ALL FURTHER DOCUMENTS MUST BE FILED UNDER THE CASE NUMBER AND CAPTION OF THE LEAD CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2925428 RECEIVED ON 07/23/2020 11:19:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 07/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2020 09:11:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL CONTINUED TO 02/07/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE RICHARD LEE FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2918848 RECEIVED ON 06/24/2020 04:07:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 06/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/07/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1733261 RECEIVED ON 03/20/2020 06:12:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 05/26/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ON 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATHWAYS COMMUNITY SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Balderrama, Francisco V