This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2017 at 08:50:34 (UTC).

DENNIS PARKER VS. AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 03/14/2012 DENNIS PARKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DENNIS PARKER

ELLIOT PARKER

JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

JAMES PARKER

ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTERES

DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTERES

EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

EARL PARKER

ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED

DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED

JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED

Defendants

WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF

AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

TALBERT MEDICAL GROUP

RICHARD ALDANA

BEACH WHITMAN COWDREY LLP

WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WI

TALBERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC

WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM

WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCNULTY LAW FIRM

Defendant Attorneys

BEACH WHITMAN COWDREY LLP

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOLS

RYAN, DATOMI & MOSELY LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11433170 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11257042.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11433170 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11257042.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 08/15/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 08/15/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/14/2013 09:23:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/14/2013 09:23:00 AM.

ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/25/2013

ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/25/2013

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 04/15/2013

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 04/15/2013

OPPOSITION FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 04/04/2013

OPPOSITION FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 04/04/2013

OPPOSITION FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 04/04/2013

OPPOSITION FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 04/04/2013

NOTICE OF LODGING (OF RECORDS REVIEWED) FILED BY WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 02/19/2013

NOTICE OF LODGING (OF RECORDS REVIEWED) FILED BY WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 02/19/2013

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 02/15/2013

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 02/15/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/08/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/08/2013

NOTICE OF RULING (AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 08/14/2012

NOTICE OF RULING (AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 08/14/2012

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TALBERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC; ALDANA, RICHARD ON 07/19/2012

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TALBERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC; ALDANA, RICHARD ON 07/19/2012

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 07/10/2012

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 07/10/2012

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 06/14/2012

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 06/14/2012

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 05/25/2012

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 05/25/2012

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY ALDANA, RICHARD; WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM; WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 05/02/2012

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY ALDANA, RICHARD; WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM; WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 05/02/2012

DEMURRER FILED BY WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 04/18/2012

DEMURRER FILED BY WINDSOR ANAHEIM HEALTHCARE, LTD DBA WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF ANAHEIM ON 04/18/2012

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 03/14/2012

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 03/14/2012

139 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 08/21/2013 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 08/19/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 465673 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2013 02:26:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1106663 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11433170 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11257042.

    Read MoreRead Less
227 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TALBERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC; ALDANA, RICHARD ON 04/18/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, EARL; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, JAMES ON 04/05/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS ON 04/02/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 03/29/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 03/29/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11104586 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10928478.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FIRMAT, FRANCISCO ON 03/14/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 03/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 03/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PARKER, DENNIS; PARKER, JAMES; PARKER, ELLIOT; PARKER, EARL; DENNIS PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; JAMES PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; ELLIOT PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED; EARL PARKER, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HELEN ROBERTA PARKER, DECEASED ON 03/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less