This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 04:38:38 (UTC).

DENISE ESTRADA VS. RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 DENISE ESTRADA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Denise Estrada

Defendants

Quality Loan Service Corporation

Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Mark S. Martinez

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13101502 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12929504.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13101502 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12929504.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21206005 RECEIVED ON 09/07/2022 11:21:56 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41380101 RECEIVED ON 09/01/2022 02:55:01 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13101502 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12929504.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 09/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rushmore Loan Management Service LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Law Office of Mark S. Martinez