This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 13:32:55 (UTC).

DELGADO - ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 DELGADO - ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT was filed as a Probate - Mental Health lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Mental Health

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES

Respondent

CESAR DELGADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

Respondent Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingDescription: MENTAL HEALTH HEARING; Department: C09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31090937 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2021 12:29:38 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/29/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MENTAL HEALTH HEARING 11/23/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/14/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41265940 RECEIVED ON 11/18/2021 08:48:45 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketPLAN FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/18/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21090550 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2021 04:45:42 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/17/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/23/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MENTAL HEALTH HEARING 11/16/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/23/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (APPOINTING THE OC PUBLIC DEFENDER) FILED BY PUBLIC DEFENDER ON 11/12/2021; Filing Party: PUBLIC DEFENDER ON 11/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41262494 RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021 01:33:35 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/09/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21086966 RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021 08:31:29 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/09/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/09/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 11/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less