This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:11 (UTC).

DEEANN RENEE NEWMAN VS. MARIA JENEI

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 DEEANN RENEE NEWMAN filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against MARIA JENEI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEEANN RENEE NEWMAN

Respondent

MARIA JENEI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NEWMAN FAMILY LAW

 

Court Documents

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 02/26/2016

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928126 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752351.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928126 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752351.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 07/20/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 07/20/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 07/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4578825 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2016 01:28:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928126 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752351.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY NEWMAN, DEEANN RENEE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446786 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:29:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.