This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/17/2023 at 03:50:44 (UTC).

DB INSURANCE COMPANY VS. LARRY GENE PFAFFLY

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 DB INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LARRY GENE PFAFFLY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DB Insurance Company

Defendants

Carol A Pfaffly

Larry Gene Pfaffly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthiesen, Wickert & Lehrer. S.C.

Defendant Attorney

Masserman & Ducey

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/02/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/02/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/02/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/02/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/02/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/02/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13175822 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13003928.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13175822 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13003928.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/23/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/23/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/23/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/23/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PFAFFLY, CAROL A; PFAFFLY, LARRY GENE ON 03/13/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PFAFFLY, CAROL A; PFAFFLY, LARRY GENE ON 03/13/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13196601 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13024727.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13196601 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13024727.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (21-01223290) FILED ON 04/04/2023

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (21-01223290) FILED ON 04/04/2023

 

Docket Entries

04/11/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31291702 RECEIVED ON 04/04/2023 03:22:41 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE (21-01223290) FILED ON 04/04/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13196601 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13024727.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41459812 RECEIVED ON 03/13/2023 01:10:53 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PFAFFLY, CAROL A; PFAFFLY, LARRY GENE ON 03/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41451693 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023 10:01:18 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21276006 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023 10:01:18 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13175822 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13003928.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31264461 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2023 09:51:09 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/02/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/02/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DB INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/02/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less