This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:29:08 (UTC).

DAWN L. SMALL VS. BARBARA L. KEELER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 DAWN L SMALL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARBARA L KEELER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAWN L. SMALL

MARY G. VAUGHT

Defendant

BARBARA L. KEELER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2016
  • DISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 325956 TO SMALL, DAWN L ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 3,959.20 DUE TO OTHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR PAYOUT SUBMITTED TO FISCAL ON 09/09/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • JUDGMENT CREDITORS REQUEST FOR FUNDS SUBMITTED BY VAUGHT, MARY G. REJECTED ON 09/09/2016.; Filing Party: CREDITORS REQUEST FOR FUNDS SUBMITTED BY VAUGHT, MARY G. REJECTED ON 09/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • JUDGMENT CREDITORS REQUEST FOR FUNDS FILED BY SMALL, DAWN L. ON 09/08/2016; Filing Party: SMALL, DAWN L. ON 09/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • NOTICE TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR MAILED FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/06/2016; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KEELER, BARBARA FOR 11 - JUDGMENT PAID TO COURT - SMALL CLAIMS, JUDGMENT PAID TO COURT IN THE AMOUNT OF 3,979.20, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12024631 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11848642.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • REQUEST TO PAY JUDGMENT TO COURT FILED BY KEELER, BARBARA L. ON 09/02/2016; Filing Party: KEELER, BARBARA L. ON 09/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • THE COURT ORDERS MARY G. VAUGHT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12015578 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11839643.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SMALL, DAWN L.; VAUGHT, MARY G. ON 08/10/2016; Filing Party: SMALL, DAWN L.; VAUGHT, MARY G. ON 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 5.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11958476 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11782601.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/18/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY VAUGHT, MARY G.; SMALL, DAWN L. ON 04/27/2016; Filing Party: VAUGHT, MARY G.; SMALL, DAWN L. ON 04/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUBMITTED BY SMALL, DAWN L. REJECTED ON 03/02/2016.; Filing Party: SERVICE SUBMITTED BY SMALL, DAWN L. REJECTED ON 03/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927101 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751326.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY SMALL, DAWN L.; VAUGHT, MARY G. ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: SMALL, DAWN L.; VAUGHT, MARY G. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.