This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:22 (UTC).

DAVID RONA VS. G6 HOSPITALITY, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 DAVID RONA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against G6 HOSPITALITY, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID RONA

Defendants

MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP

G6 HOSPITALITY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAYMOND GHERMEZIAN, APLC

Defendant Attorney

FARMER CASE & FEDOR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RONA, DAVID ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RONA, DAVID ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 04/25/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 04/25/2017

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 05/15/2017

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 05/15/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/19/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/19/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.

COMPLAINT FILED BY RONA, DAVID ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY RONA, DAVID ON 02/26/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1487262 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1487262 REJECTED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 04/18/2017

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 04/18/2017

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 04/25/2017

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 04/25/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11944457 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11768643.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11944457 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11768643.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 04/25/2017

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 04/25/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 10/02/2017 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 10/02/2017 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 05/15/2017

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 05/15/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RONA, DAVID ON 07/18/2017

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RONA, DAVID ON 07/18/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 04/25/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 04/25/2017

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY G6 HOSPITALITY, LLC; MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 02/10/2017

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY G6 HOSPITALITY, LLC; MOTEL 6 OPERATING, LP ON 02/10/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1487262 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3639471 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 10/30/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 10/02/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/30/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C26.

    Read MoreRead Less
137 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • RONA, DAVID REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 02/29/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY RONA, DAVID ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RONA, DAVID ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RONA, DAVID ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY RONA, DAVID ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509602 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 12:26:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.