This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 11:49:46 (UTC).

DAVID PEAK VS. PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 DAVID PEAK filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PERSPECTA STATE LOCAL INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Peak

Defendants

Albert Hatcher

DXC Technology Company

DXC Technology Services LLC

David Hoffman

George Polites

Peraton Inc.

Peraton State & Local Inc.

Perspecta Engineering, Inc

Perspecta Enterprise Solutions LLC

Perspecta State & Local Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Southern California Labor Law Group, PC

Defendant Attorney

The Kullman Firm

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PEAK, DAVID ON 01/06/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PEAK, DAVID ON 01/06/2023

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

CASE REASSIGNED TO THOMAS MCCONVILLE EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CASE REASSIGNED TO THOMAS MCCONVILLE EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/15/2022 04:49:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/15/2022 04:49:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13131585 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12959656.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13131585 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12959656.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PEAK, DAVID ON 11/02/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PEAK, DAVID ON 11/02/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PEAK, DAVID ON 11/02/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PEAK, DAVID ON 11/02/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 11/01/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 11/01/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13108011 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12936024.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13108011 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12936024.

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 09/15/2022

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 09/15/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 09/15/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 09/15/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 09/15/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 09/15/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 09/15/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 09/15/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 09/15/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 09/15/2022

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENGINEERING, INC; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 08/05/2022

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY; DXC TECHNOLOGY SERVICES LLC; PERATON INC.; PERATON STATE & LOCAL INC.; PERSPECTA ENGINEERING, INC; PERSPECTA ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS LLC; PERSPECTA STATE & LOCAL INC. ON 08/05/2022

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; Judge: MCCONVILLE; Department: C28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCONVILLE; Department: C28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C28 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PEAK, DAVID ON 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21255839 RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023 12:19:23 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2023 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C28 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION REASSIGNED TO C28 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 02/06/2023 AT 02:00:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41351637 RECEIVED ON 06/27/2022 09:48:46 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PEAK, DAVID ON 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21176067 RECEIVED ON 06/27/2022 09:48:37 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/17/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13063731 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12891724.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21171612 RECEIVED ON 06/15/2022 11:36:04 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 06/15/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PEAK, DAVID ON 06/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PEAK, DAVID ON 06/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PEAK, DAVID ON 06/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less