Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 08:19:40 (UTC).

DAVID MENDOZA VS. DAVID WEISS

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 DAVID MENDOZA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID WEISS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID MENDOZA

STEPHANIE MENDOZA

ShowFX, Inc.

Defendants

SONJA WEISS

DAVID WEISS

Sonja Vaisz

David Vaisz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ORVANDO BOWEN LLP

Ovando Bowen LLP

Defendant Attorney

Reich Radcliffe & Hoover LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551666 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375545.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551666 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375545.

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 05/13/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 05/13/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 05/13/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 05/13/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/18/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/18/2019 09:00:00 AM.

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY VAISZ, DAVID; VAISZ, SONJA ON 04/11/2019

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY VAISZ, DAVID; VAISZ, SONJA ON 04/11/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 04/11/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 04/11/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 04/08/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 04/08/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 04/08/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 04/08/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 03/26/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 03/26/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 03/11/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 03/11/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 03/11/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SHOWFX, INC.; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 03/11/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MENDOZA, STEPHANIE; SHOWFX, INC. ON 03/05/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MENDOZA, STEPHANIE; SHOWFX, INC. ON 03/05/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 12/05/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 12/05/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 10/16/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 10/16/2018.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 10/16/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 10/16/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 10/16/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 10/16/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 10/16/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 10/16/2018

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551666 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375545.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3790785 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2019 11:27:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/18/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/03/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C-42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/03/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C-42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/03/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/03/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12534647 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12358426.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 12/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 12/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3736423 RECEIVED ON 12/05/2018 09:47:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/14/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 10/16/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12437381 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12261060.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 10/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 10/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MENDOZA, DAVID; MENDOZA, STEPHANIE ON 10/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4897831 RECEIVED ON 10/16/2018 01:48:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHOWFX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant