This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 03:58:52 (UTC).

DAVID LEE VS. SC&P RESOURCES, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 DAVID LEE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SC P RESOURCES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Lee

Defendants

Andrew Yung Ki Park

SC&P Resources, Inc.

Pepromene Bio, Inc.

Yung Ki Park

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ardent Law Group, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

Lee Anav Chung White Kim Ruger & Richter LLP

Other Attorneys

LEE ANAV CHUNG WHITE KIM RUGER & RICHT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 04/26/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 04/26/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 04/26/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 04/26/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 04/26/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 04/26/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12542122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12365941.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12542122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12365941.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 04/26/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 04/26/2019.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 05/13/2019

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 05/13/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 05/13/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 05/13/2019

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 06/12/2019

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 06/12/2019

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 06/12/2019

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 06/12/2019

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 07/08/2019

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 07/08/2019

DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PEPROMENE BIO, INC.; PARK, YUNG KI ON 07/24/2019

DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PEPROMENE BIO, INC.; PARK, YUNG KI ON 07/24/2019

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PEPROMENE BIO, INC.; PARK, YUNG KI ON 07/24/2019

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PEPROMENE BIO, INC.; PARK, YUNG KI ON 07/24/2019

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PEPROMENE BIO, INC.; PARK, YUNG KI ON 07/24/2019

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PEPROMENE BIO, INC.; PARK, YUNG KI ON 07/24/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 930.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12597472 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12421571.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 930.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12597472 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12421571.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 09/26/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 09/26/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 930.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12597472 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12421571.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PEPROMENE BIO, INC.; PARK, YUNG KI ON 07/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PEPROMENE BIO, INC.; PARK, YUNG KI ON 07/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PEPROMENE BIO, INC.; PARK, YUNG KI ON 07/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3816321 RECEIVED ON 07/24/2019 07:23:06 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 07/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3810025 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2019 02:28:03 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 06/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3801803 RECEIVED ON 06/12/2019 07:14:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 05/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 05/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4968986 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2019 07:05:01 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 04/26/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12542122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12365941.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 04/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 04/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY LEE, DAVID ON 04/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4963272 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2019 11:11:10 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less