This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/22/2019 at 06:44:44 (UTC).

DAVID FISHER VS. OMNI CONTRACTING

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 DAVID FISHER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OMNI CONTRACTING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michelle Fisher

David Fisher

Defendant and Other

OMNI CONTRACTING

Cross Defendants

U.S. Specialty Insurance Company

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Developers Surety and Indemnity Company

Rainstoppers Inc.

Bellisimo Tilr & Marble, Inc.

Suretec Indemnity Company

Bryan Jennings Cahill

the Western Surety Company

Glenn David Daunch

Elasto Life Coatings

El Valle Plastering, Inc.

First Class Glass, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bremer, Whyte, Brown & O'Meara, LLP

Defendant and Other Attorney

Plumtree & Associates

Cross Defendant Attorney

Intelink Law Group, PC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12675034 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12499790.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12675034 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12499790.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 12/12/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 12/12/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 12/12/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 12/12/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 11/27/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 11/27/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 11/19/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 11/19/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 11/19/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 11/19/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12661974 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12486653.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12661974 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12486653.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12675034 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12499790.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 12/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 12/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1698092 RECEIVED ON 12/12/2019 10:54:46 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1695205 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2019 04:30:37 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2866594 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2019 01:17:03 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1695021 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2019 01:15:55 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FISHER, DAVID; FISHER, MICHELLE ON 11/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41033964 RECEIVED ON 11/13/2019 10:31:52 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/02/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 01/28/2020 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 10/09/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12636543 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12461042.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FISHER, DAVID; FISHER, MICHELLE ON 10/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FISHER, DAVID; FISHER, MICHELLE ON 10/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FISHER, DAVID; FISHER, MICHELLE ON 10/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2846757 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2019 02:25:50 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less